Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Ancona-Osimo

Archidioecesis Anconitanus-Auximanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Edoardo Menichelli, Archbishop
  • Franco Festorazzi, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • United: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 501 (193 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Marche
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesi.ancona.it/
  • Mailing Address: Piazza del Senato 7, 60121 Ancona, Italia
  • Telephone: 071.20.74.703; 071.20.23.40
  • Fax: 071.20.85.822

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Ancona
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Ancona (erected)
Diocese of Ancona e Numana
19 October 1422UnitedDiocese of Ancona
Diocese of Numana
Diocese of Ancona e Numana
Archdiocese of Ancona e Numana
14 September 1904ElevatedDiocese of Ancona e Numana Archdiocese of Ancona e Numana
15 August 1972ElevatedArchdiocese of Ancona e Numana (became a Metropolitan)
Archdiocese of Ancona (-Numana)
5 July 1975Name ChangedArchdiocese of Ancona e Numana Archdiocese of Ancona (-Numana)
Archdiocese of Ancona-Osimo
30 September 1986UnitedArchdiocese of Ancona (-Numana)
Diocese of Osimo
Archdiocese of Ancona-Osimo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Ancona e Numana
1959129,500130,00099.6%719016180410523846ap1960
1969153,000153,42899.7%898817786410028052ap1971
Archdiocese of Ancona (-Numana)
1980152,500153,50099.3%827515797119820958ap1981
Archdiocese of Ancona-Osimo
1990204,310208,21898.1%111922031,006414024471ap1991
1999205,214206,83199.2%108821901,080810120672ap2000
2000205,682207,22099.3%115821971,04489920372ap2001
2001206,598208,74799.0%110791891,093159419672ap2002
2002205,682207,22099.3%108821901,082159619272ap2003
2003210,062212,87598.7%108761841,141158917372ap2004
2004205,204212,34096.6%109721811,133168216572ap2005
2006206,541216,85895.2%100751751,180178812472ap2007
2012197,851225,44187.8%89391281,54518458672ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 11 Aug 2014