Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista (Giambattista) Cardinal Bussi

Deceased

Bishop of Ancona e Numana

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1657BornViterbo
25 Jun 170649.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
6 Jul 170649.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
12 Sep 170649.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
23 Oct 170649.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Münster, Germany
1707¹49.7ResignedApostolic Administrator of Münster, Germany
19 Feb 171052.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ancona e Numana, Italy
18 May 171255.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
26 Sep 171255.4Elevated to Cardinal
30 Jan 171355.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
23 Dec 172669.7DiedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista (Giambattista) Bussi:
Giovanni Battista (Giambattista) Cardinal Bussi (born , died ) Bishop of Ancona e Numana

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
  • a cardinal for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1712
  • b/c2+: CB, 21 Dec 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 4 Aug 2015