Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal de Accolti de Aretio

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1455BornFlorence, Italy
4 Apr 150550.1AppointedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
1511²55.8AppointedAdministrator of Maillezais, France
10 Mar 151156.0Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 151156.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
6 Jun 151156.2AppointedAdministrator of Cádiz, Spain
5 Apr 151459.1ResignedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
10 Mar 151863.0AppointedAdministrator of Arras, France
24 Jul 152166.4ResignedAdministrator of Cádiz, Spain
8 Sep 152368.5ResignedAdministrator of Arras, France
8 Dec 152368.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
20 May 152469.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
15 Jun 152469.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
15 Jun 152469.3AppointedAdministrator of Ravenna, Italy
17 Aug 152469.4ResignedAdministrator of Ravenna, Italy
18 Aug 152469.4AppointedAdministrator of Cremona, Italy
5 May 152772.1ResignedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
1528²72.8ResignedAdministrator of Cremona, Italy
11 Dec 153277.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro de Accolti de Aretio:
Cardinal Pietro de Accolti de Aretio (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a cardinal for 21.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1511
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 107, and Page 283
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 37, Number 170

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Nov 2013