Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Ricci

Deceased

Archbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1845Born
21 Sep 186722.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 189550.8AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
1 Dec 189550.8Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
9 Jun 190257.3AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
21 Jul 190661.4AppointedArchbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
10 Nov 192984.7DiedArchbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Ricci (VIAF: 90084771)
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Ricci (born , died ) Archbishop of Ancona e Numana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontenovo
Ordained BishopXII Apotres, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 79, and Page 357
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 53
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017