Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo de Ricco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ravello, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 May 1406AppointedBishop of Ancona, Italy
19 Dec 1412AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
10 Jan 1419AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
18 Feb 1435AppointedBishop of Ravello, Italy
1455¹ResignedBishop of Ravello, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo de Ricco
Bishop Lorenzo de Ricco , Bishop Emeritus of Ravello

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 221, and Page 169
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 286, and Page 447
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 Aug 2018

Quantcast