Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudio Giuliodori

Bishop Emeritus of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia

Note/Previous Titular See: (Assistente Ecclesiastico Generale)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1958 BornOsimo
16 Apr 198325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
30 Sep 198628.7IncardinatedPriest of Ancona-Osimo, Italy
22 Feb 200749.1AppointedBishop of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia, Italy
31 Mar 200749.2Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia, Italy
26 Feb 201355.1ResignedBishop of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Claudio Giuliodori:
Bishop Claudio Giuliodori (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,360
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015