Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marco Giovanni Della Pietra, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1882Born
4 Sep 190422.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
25 Mar 194058.0AppointedArchbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
12 May 194058.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
13 Jan 194562.8DiedArchbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Giovanni Della Pietra
Archbishop Marco Giovanni Della Pietra O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Ancona e Numana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRovigno d'Istria

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1946
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast