Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Barili

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1801Born
2 Sep 182725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ancona e Numana, Italy
26 May 185149.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Colombia
26 May 185149.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Venezuela
26 May 185149.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Ecuador
26 May 185149.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Peru
26 May 185149.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Bolivia
26 May 185149.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Chile
26 May 185149.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Argentina
17 Jun 185654.5ResignedApostolic Delegate to Colombia
17 Jun 185654.5ResignedApostolic Delegate to Venezuela
17 Jun 185654.5ResignedApostolic Delegate to Ecuador
17 Jun 185654.5ResignedApostolic Delegate to Peru
17 Jun 185654.5ResignedApostolic Delegate to Bolivia
17 Jun 185654.5ResignedApostolic Delegate to Chile
17 Jun 185654.5ResignedApostolic Delegate to Argentina
3 Aug 185755.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyana
1 Nov 185755.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyana
13 Nov 185755.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
13 Mar 186866.2Elevated to Cardinal
24 Sep 186866.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
6 Sep 187270.7AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
8 Mar 187573.2DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Barili (VIAF: 22190328)
Lorenzo Cardinal Barili (born , died ) Prefect of Indulgences and Relics

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncona, Diocese of Ancona e Numana, Italy, Italy
Ordained PriestAncona, Diocese of Ancona e Numana, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ancona, Diocese of Ancona e Numana, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Ancona, Diocese of Ancona e Numana, Italy

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
  • a cardinal for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 573, and Page 46
  • ab/1851: LB, 20 Jul 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017