Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guglielmo della Vigna, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Todi


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Feb 1386AppointedBishop of Ancona, Italy
12 Jun 1405AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
28 Oct 1407DiedBishop of Todi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo della Vigna:
Bishop Guglielmo della Vigna O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Todi

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 502, and Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Jul 2014