Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Pomares y Morant

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1877BornCamerata Picena
27 Aug 192144.6AppointedBishop of Foggia, Italy
1 Nov 192144.7Ordained BishopBishop of Foggia, Italy
16 Oct 192447.7AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
14 Dec 192447.9DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Pomares y Morant:
Archbishop Pietro Pomares y Morant (born , died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1921, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013