Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicola Cardinal Riganti

Deceased

Bishop of Ancona e Numana

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1744³BornMolfetta
14 Aug 176824.3Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 181671.9AppointedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
8 Mar 181671.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Apr 181672.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
29 Apr 181672.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
31 Aug 182278.4DiedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Riganti:
Nicola Cardinal Riganti (born , died ) Bishop of Ancona e Numana

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
  • a cardinal for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1816, Number 9
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 2 Feb 2015