Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Serfilippi, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jesi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1929Born
13 Mar 195424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
3 Sep 197545.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ancona (-Numana), Italy
3 Sep 197545.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
27 Sep 197545.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxula Prates
197747.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jesi, Italy
1 Mar 197848.4AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
23 Apr 197848.5InstalledBishop of Jesi, Italy
20 Mar 200676.4RetiredBishop of Jesi, Italy
20 May 200676.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Jesi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Oscar Serfilippi
Bishop Oscar Serfilippi O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jesi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMondolfo

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2006
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast