Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Conti

Deceased

Bishop of Ancona e Numana

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1556BornRome
1 Jul 158528.8AppointedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
21 Jul 158528.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
9 Jun 160447.8Elevated to Cardinal
1 Jun 160548.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
17 Aug 160549.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
7 Jan 161356.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
3 Dec 161559.3DiedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Conti:
Cardinal Carlo Conti (born , died ) Bishop of Ancona e Numana

  • a bishop for 30.4 years
  • a cardinal for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Jun 1604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 108
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 23, Number 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013