Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luciano Paolucci Bedini

Bishop of Gubbio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1968 Born
24 Sep 199426.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ancona-Osimo, Italy
30 Sep 199527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ancona-Osimo, Italy
29 Sep 201749.0AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
3 Dec 201749.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luciano Paolucci Bedini
Bishop Luciano Paolucci Bedini (born ) Bishop of Gubbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJesi, Diocese of Jesi
Ordained BishopSan Domenico, Church, Gubbio, Diocese of Gubbio

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gubbio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Sep 2017
  • od/c01: CB, 29 Sep 2017
  • ob/c2+: CB, 11 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 4 Dec 2017