Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Maccari

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ancona-Osimo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1913Born
6 Dec 193623.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 196148.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
29 Jun 196148.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
31 Oct 196350.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Mondovi, Italy
5 Aug 196855.5AppointedArchbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
28 Sep 197259.7AppointedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
5 Jul 197562.4AppointedArchbishop of Ancona (-Numana), Italy
30 Sep 198673.7AppointedArchbishop of Ancona-Osimo, Italy
1 Jul 198976.4RetiredArchbishop of Ancona-Osimo, Italy
17 Apr 199784.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ancona-Osimo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Maccari
Archbishop Carlo Maccari (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ancona-Osimo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCantone di Parrano

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Aug 2017