Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Spina

Archbishop of Ancona-Osimo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1954 Born
1977²22.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Boiano-Campobasso, Italy
5 Jan 198025.1Ordained PriestPriest of Boiano-Campobasso, Italy
3 Apr 200752.3AppointedBishop of Sulmona-Valva, Italy
9 Jun 200752.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sulmona-Valva, Italy
23 Jun 200752.6InstalledBishop of Sulmona-Valva, Italy
14 Jul 201762.6AppointedArchbishop of Ancona-Osimo, Italy
1 Oct 201762.8InstalledArchbishop of Ancona-Osimo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Spina (VIAF: 90180463)
Archbishop Angelo Spina (born ) Archbishop of Ancona-Osimo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColle D’Anchise, Diocese of Boiano-Campobasso
Ordained PriestColle D’Anchise, Archdiocese of Boiano-Campobasso
Ordained BishopSantuario dell’Addolorata, Castelpetroso, Archdiocese of Campobasso-Boiano

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ancona-Osimo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,432
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 9 Jan 2018