Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giulio Cardinal Savelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1574¹BornRome
2 Dec 161541.9Elevated to Cardinal
11 Jan 161642.0AppointedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
11 Jan 161642.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
2 May 162248.3ResignedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
28 Jan 163056.0AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
10 Nov 163662.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
28 Mar 163965.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
15 Sep 164268.7ResignedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
9 Jul 164470.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giulio Savelli:
Giulio Cardinal Savelli (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

  • a cardinal for 28.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Dec 1615
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 82, and Page 301
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 14 Feb 2015