Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Fabriano-Matelica

Dioecesis Fabrianensis-Mathelicensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Giancarlo Vecerrica, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Ancona-Osimo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 681 (263 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Marche
  • Official Web Site: http://www.fabriano-matelica.it/
  • Mailing Address: Vescovado, Piazza Papa Giovanni Paolo II 2, 60044 Fabriano [Ancona], Italia
  • Telephone: 0732.30.49
  • Fax: 0732.22.142

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Fabriano
15 November 1728ErectedDiocese of Fabriano (erected)
Diocese of Fabriano e Matelica
8 July 1785UnitedDiocese of Fabriano
Diocese of Matelica
Diocese of Fabriano e Matelica
Diocese of Fabriano-Matelica
30 September 1986Name ChangedDiocese of Fabriano e Matelica Diocese of Fabriano-Matelica

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Fabriano e Matelica
195028,00028,000100.0%4518634443712035ap1951
197038,38738,40999.9%98391372804814446ap1971
198038,80039,20099.0%53368943514711248ap1981
Diocese of Fabriano-Matelica
199051,30051,62299.4%64481124586713558ap1991
199953,63054,13099.1%552681662349758ap2000
200053,73054,83098.0%522476706329558ap2001
200153,64154,59198.3%512879679329458ap2002
200253,90054,90098.2%492473738289258ap2003
200353,72054,95097.8%472370767279158ap2004
200453,00054,18897.8%492978679359858ap2005
200652,00054,85094.8%452772722339458ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014