Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Antonio Fatati

Deceased

Bishop of Ancona e Numana


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Nov 1450AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
3 Nov 1463AppointedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
9 Jan 1484DiedBishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bl. Antonio Fatati:
Bishop Bl. Antonio Fatati (died ) Bishop of Ancona e Numana

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 87, and Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 20 Apr 2014