Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Pichi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1787Born
29 Apr 181022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ancona e Numana, Italy
25 May 181830.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
12 Jul 181830.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lydda
21 May 182739.6AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
12 Dec 184053.1ResignedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
17 Dec 184053.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heliopolis in Phoenicia
31 Aug 186173.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Pichi
Archbishop Francesco Pichi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAncona, Diocese of Ancona e Numana
Ordained BishopAncona, Diocese of Ancona e Numana

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 212, and Page 247
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 370
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 66
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1845, Page 299
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,349

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast