Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Farnese (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1520BornCastello Valentino
1 Nov 153414.1AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
18 Dec 153414.2Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 153414.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
30 Jul 153514.8AppointedAdministrator of Jaén, Spain
13 Aug 153514.8AppointedAdministrator of Avignon, France
13 Aug 153514.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Lorenzo in Damaso
15 May 153615.6AppointedAdministrator of Monreale, Italy
153716.2AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
17 Jun 153716.7AppointedAdministrator of Bitonto, Italy
6 Jul 153716.7ResignedAdministrator of Jaén, Spain
8 Jan 153817.3ResignedAdministrator of Bitonto, Italy
15 Nov 153818.1AppointedAdministrator of Massa Marittima, Italy
27 Aug 153918.9AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
16 Jul 154019.8AppointedAdministrator of Cavaillon, France
20 Jul 154120.8ResignedAdministrator of Cavaillon, France
154322.2AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
1544²23.2AppointedAdministrator of Bitonto, Italy
27 Oct 154424.1ResignedAdministrator of Bitonto, Italy
22 Apr 154726.5AppointedAdministrator of Viseu, Portugal
1550¹29.2ResignedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
15 Jun 155130.7ResignedAdministrator of Avignon, France
27 Jun 155231.7ResignedAdministrator of Viseu, Portugal
28 Apr 155332.6AppointedAdministrator of Tours, France
25 Jun 155433.7AppointedAdministrator of Viviers (Aps), France
12 Nov 155434.1AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
12 Nov 155434.1ResignedAdministrator of Viviers (Aps), France
1555²34.2AppointedAdministrator of Spoleto, Italy
22 Nov 155636.1AppointedAdministrator of Benevento, Italy
155736.2ResignedBishop of Cahors, France
14 Jan 155837.3ResignedAdministrator of Benevento, Italy
1560²39.2AppointedAdministrator of Avignon, France
16 Dec 156242.2ResignedAdministrator of Spoleto, Italy
14 Apr 156443.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
12 May 156443.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
7 Feb 156544.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
1566¹45.2ResignedAdministrator of Avignon, France
14 Jan 156847.3AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
9 Dec 157353.2ResignedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
9 Jul 157857.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
5 Dec 158060.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
24 Feb 158564.4AppointedAdministrator of Ancona e Numana, Italy
1 Jul 158564.7ResignedAdministrator of Ancona e Numana, Italy
2 Mar 158968.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Farnese (Jr.):
Cardinal Alessandro Farnese (Jr.) (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a cardinal for 54.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1534
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 270, and Page 250
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 127, and Page 303
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 237, and Page 210
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 108, and Page 132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 138, and Page 161

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013