Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Charles Thomas

Bishop Emeritus of Versailles, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1929 Born
5 Jul 195323.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 197242.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aire et Dax, France
13 Mar 197242.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Numidia
1 May 197242.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Numidia
4 Feb 197444.1AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
23 Dec 198657.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Versailles, France
4 Jun 198858.4SucceededBishop of Versailles, France
11 Jan 200171.0ResignedBishop of Versailles, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Charles Thomas (VIAF: 12315719)
Bishop Jean-Charles Thomas (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Versailles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Martin-des-Noyers

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Versailles.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Jul 2018

Quantcast