Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis de Fromentières

Deceased

Bishop of Aire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1632BornSaint-Denis de Gastine
12 Jun 167340.6AppointedBishop of Aire, France
1 Oct 167340.9Ordained BishopBishop of Aire, France
18 Dec 168452.1DiedBishop of Aire, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis de Fromentières:
Bishop Jean-Louis de Fromentières (born , died ) Bishop of Aire

  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 70
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015