Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie Pierre Jean Cassaigne, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Saigon, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Gadara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1895Born
6 Jun 192530.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Société des Missions Etrangères
19 Dec 192530.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
20 Feb 194146.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Saigon, Viet Nam
20 Feb 194146.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Gadara
24 Jun 194146.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gadara
20 Sep 195560.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Saigon, Viet Nam
31 Oct 197378.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Saigon, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Marie Pierre Jean Cassaigne (VIAF: 5000342)
Bishop Marie Pierre Jean Cassaigne M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Saigon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrgons-Grenade, Diocese of Aire et Dax, France
Ordained DeaconForeign Missions, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestForeign Missions, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saigon, Vicariate Apostolic of Saigon
Death PlaceDjiring

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 34
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast