Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard de Sariac

Deceased

Bishop of Aire


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Mar 1659AppointedBishop of Aire, France
1 Jun 1659Ordained BishopBishop of Aire, France
12 Oct 1672DiedBishop of Aire, France

MicroData Summary for Bernard de Sariac:
Bishop Bernard de Sariac (died ) Bishop of Aire

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 69
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 10 Apr 2015