Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Foix de Candale

Deceased

Bishop of Aire, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1512Born
18 Jul 157663.9AppointedBishop of Aire, France
1578¹65.3Ordained BishopBishop of Aire, France
5 Feb 159481.4DiedBishop of Aire, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Foix de Candale (VIAF: 56867562)
Bishop François de Foix de Candale (born , died ) Bishop of Aire

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux
Ordained BishopBordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux
Death PlaceBordeaux, Archdiocese of Bordeaux

  • a bishop for 16.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 95
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1578, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018