Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Gaspard de Montmorin de Saint-Hérem

Deceased

Bishop of Aire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1657¹BornJenzat
10 Nov 171053.8AppointedBishop of Aire, France
4 Jan 171154.0Ordained BishopBishop of Aire, France
7 Nov 172366.8DiedBishop of Aire, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Gaspard de Montmorin de Saint-Hérem:
Bishop Joseph-Gaspard de Montmorin de Saint-Hérem (born 1657, died ) Bishop of Aire

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 70
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015