Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Pierre Sarrabère

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aire et Dax, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1926Born
29 Jun 195023.8Ordained PriestPriest
7 Nov 197448.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Aire et Dax, France
7 Nov 197448.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Vassinassa
5 Jan 197548.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vassinassa
25 Apr 197851.6SucceededBishop of Aire et Dax, France
18 Jun 200275.8RetiredBishop of Aire et Dax, France
7 Jan 200780.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Montauban, France
11 May 200780.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Montauban, France
11 Jan 201790.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Aire et Dax, France

MicroData Summary for Robert Pierre Sarrabère
Bishop Robert Pierre Sarrabère (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aire et Dax

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArgagnon
Death PlaceBordeaux

  • a priest for 66.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 12 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Jan 2017