Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis Cardinal d’Albret

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro

Bishop of Tarbes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1422BornFrance
7 Jan 144522.0AppointedBishop of Aire, France
4 Jul 146037.5AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
18 Dec 146139.0Elevated to Cardinal
31 May 146239.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
9 Jan 146542.0AppointedBishop of Tarbes, France
4 Sep 146542.7DiedBishop of Cahors, France

MicroData Summary for Louis d’Albret:
Cardinal Louis d’Albret (born , died ) Bishop of Cahors

  • a cardinal for 3.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1461

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013