Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Hippolyte Sarthou, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin

Titular Bishop of Myriophytos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1840BornDoazit, France
1861¹20.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
27 May 186626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
16 Jan 188544.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}, China
16 Jan 188544.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
26 Apr 188545.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myriophytos
6 Jun 189050.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China
13 Apr 1899³59.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Hippolyte Sarthou:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Hippolyte Sarthou C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013