Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Jean-Charles Jourdan

Apostolic Administrator of Estonia

Titular Bishop of Pertusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1960 BornDax, France
20 Aug 198828.0Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
1 Apr 200544.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Estonia
1 Apr 200544.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pertusa
10 Sep 200545.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pertusa

MicroData Summary for Philippe Jean-Charles Jourdan:
Bishop Philippe Jean-Charles Jourdan (born ) Apostolic Administrator of Estonia

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Administration of Estonia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,972

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013