Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sébastien-Charles-Philibert de Roger de Cahuzac de Caux

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1745BornCaux
4 Jun 178034.5SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Aire, France
18 Sep 178034.8ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Aire, France
18 Sep 178034.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Assuras
8 Oct 178034.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assuras
26 Oct 178337.9SucceededBishop of Aire, France
1816¹70.1ResignedBishop of Aire, France
30 Oct 181771.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Aire, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sébastien-Charles-Philibert de Roger de Cahuzac de Caux:
Bishop Sébastien-Charles-Philibert de Roger de Cahuzac de Caux (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aire

  • a bishop for 37.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013