Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles de Gramont, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1486¹Born
18 Aug 151428.6AppointedBishop of Pamiers, France
25 Jun 151529.4AppointedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
24 Apr 152337.3AppointedBishop of Aire, France
9 Mar 153044.1AppointedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
15 Oct 154458.7DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles de Gramont
Archbishop Charles de Gramont O.S.A. (born 1486, died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 176, and Page 111
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 95, and Page 142
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1514, Number 25*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jun 2018

Quantcast