Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Plaicart de Raigecourt

Deceased

Bishop of Aire


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1708¹BornNancy
175749.0SelectedBishop of Aire, France
13 Mar 175850.2ConfirmedBishop of Aire, France
16 Apr 175850.3Ordained BishopBishop of Aire, France
26 Oct 178375.8DiedBishop of Aire, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Plaicart de Raigecourt:
Bishop Plaicart de Raigecourt (died ) Bishop of Aire

  • a bishop for 25.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013