Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Paolo Calbetti

Deceased

Bishop of Sarsina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1691³BornCivitella
21 Dec 171524.1Ordained PriestPriest
1 Dec 174958.0AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
8 Dec 174958.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
1 Mar 176068.3DiedBishop of Sarsina, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Paolo Calbetti:
Bishop Giovanni Paolo Calbetti (born , died ) Bishop of Sarsina

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 368
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015