Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Niccolò Recchi

Deceased

Bishop of Ripatransone, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1687Born
17 Dec 174053.1Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 174759.5AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
4 Jun 174759.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
25 Jan 176577.2DiedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luca Niccolò Recchi
Bishop Luca Niccolò Recchi (born , died ) Bishop of Ripatransone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRipatransone

  • a priest for 24.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 358
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast