Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventura (Francis Antonio) Fabozzi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Potenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1696BornDurcenta
22 Dec 171216.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
3 Dec 171923.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
24 Apr 174952.6SelectedBishop of Potenza, Italy
21 Jul 174952.8ConfirmedBishop of Potenza, Italy
25 Jul 174952.8Ordained BishopBishop of Potenza, Italy
4 Jan 176164.3DiedBishop of Potenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura (Francis Antonio) Fabozzi:
Bishop Bonaventura (Francis Antonio) Fabozzi O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Potenza

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 347
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015