Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonfelice Cardinal Zondadari

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1665Born
25 Mar 169024.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 170135.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Damascus
18 Dec 170136.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Damascus
18 Sep 170640.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
10 Apr 170943.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
18 May 171246.4Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 171549.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
9 Apr 173165.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
23 Nov 173771.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

MicroData Summary for Antonfelice Zondadari (VIAF: 232258415)
Antonfelice Cardinal Zondadari (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena, Italy
Ordained BishopChiesa Nuova, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Girogio, Siena, Archdiocese of Siena, Italy

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
  • a cardinal for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1712
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 19
  • ob/c2: AT, 23 May 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,423
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 268

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 6 Nov 2018

Quantcast