Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Francesco de Plato

Deceased

Bishop of Tricarico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1703³BornCalabritto
15 Jun 172623.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 174945.7AppointedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
9 Mar 174945.7Ordained BishopBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
3 Mar 176056.7AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
Aug 1783³80.1DiedBishop of Tricarico, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Francesco de Plato:
Bishop Antonio Francesco de Plato (born , died Aug 1783) Bishop of Tricarico

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 140, and Page 415
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015