Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Maria Queraldi y Aragona

Deceased

Bishop of Squillace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jun 1704BornBarletta
8 Jun 172723.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 174843.9AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
12 May 174843.9Ordained BishopBishop of Squillace, Italy
10 Nov 176258.4DiedBishop of Squillace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Maria Queraldi y Aragona:
Bishop Francesco Saverio Maria Queraldi y Aragona (died ) Bishop of Squillace

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013