Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Barba

Deceased

Bishop of Bitonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1690BornNapoli
8 Jul 173747.2AppointedBishop of Bitonto, Italy
14 Jul 173747.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bitonto, Italy
12 Sep 174959.4DiedBishop of Bitonto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Barba:
Bishop Giovanni Barba (born , died ) Bishop of Bitonto

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1740
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013