Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joannes Bapt. Nicolovich

Deceased

Archbishop of Skopje


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1702BornScopien
23 Sep 174341.7AppointedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
29 Sep 174341.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
Aug 175250.6DiedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia

MicroData Summary for Joannes Bapt. Nicolovich:
Archbishop Joannes Bapt. Nicolovich Archbishop of Skopje

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013