Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo Cecconi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1691³Born
15 Jul 171423.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 174857.1AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
21 Sep 174857.1Ordained BishopBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
27 Jan 176068.5ResignedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
18 Nov 177483.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Cecconi (VIAF: 29877041)
Bishop Leonardo Cecconi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Montalto (delle Marche)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalestrina, Suburbicarian See of Palestrina

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 25
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast