Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Campanile

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Satriano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1702BornBarletta
19 Jul 173331.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 173735.5AppointedBishop of Ascoli Satriano, Italy
22 Dec 173735.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Satriano, Italy
Nov 1771³69.4DiedBishop of Ascoli Satriano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Campanile:
Bishop Giuseppe Campanile (born , died Nov 1771) Bishop of Ascoli Satriano

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1737, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015