Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Serafin Torriani, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pult, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1691Born
9 Mar 174654.7AppointedBishop of Pult, Albania
20 Mar 174654.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pult, Albania
19 Sep 175463.2ResignedBishop of Pult, Albania
24 Dec 176271.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Pult, Albania

MicroData Summary for Serafin Torriani
Bishop Serafin Torriani O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pult

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlzano Maggiore, Italy

  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 349
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast