Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Zicari

Deceased

Archbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1690Born
22 Dec 171424.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 175362.4SelectedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
23 Jul 175362.6ConfirmedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
25 Jul 175362.6Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
17 Jul 175665.5SelectedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
3 Jan 175766.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
23 Oct 176069.8DiedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Zicari
Archbishop Domenico Zicari (born , died ) Archbishop of Reggio Calabria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCosenza

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 185, and Page 356
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast