Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccola Maria Calcagnini

Deceased

Bishop of Città Ducale, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1703³Born
21 Dec 172623.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Dec 172724.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 174541.5AppointedBishop of Città Ducale, Italy
16 May 174541.5Ordained BishopBishop of Città Ducale, Italy
20 Aug 178682.8DiedBishop of Città Ducale, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccola Maria Calcagnini
Bishop Niccola Maria Calcagnini (born , died ) Bishop of Città Ducale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGaeta

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1786
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 168
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast