Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Maria (Michelangelo) Salvini, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1690Born
1712¹21.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Dec 171525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Jul 173241.6AppointedArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia
24 Aug 173241.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia
10 Dec 176575.0DiedArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Maria (Michelangelo) Salvini
Archbishop Domenico Maria (Michelangelo) Salvini O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLodi, Diocese of Lodi, Italy

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 303
  • c2+: CB, 3 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1732, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast