Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Carafa

Deceased

Bishop of Nard˛


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1685³BornNapoli
20 Dec 171025.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 173650.6AppointedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
15 Apr 173650.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nard˛, Italy
1 Jul 175468.9DiedBishop of Nard˛, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Carafa:
Bishop Francesco Carafa (born , died ) Bishop of Nard˛

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1736, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015