Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Callisto Maria (Vincenzo Antonio) Palombella, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1687BornIschia
15 Mar 171023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
1 Dec 174962.8AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
8 Dec 174962.8Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
3 May 175871.2DiedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy

MicroData Summary for Callisto Maria (Vincenzo Antonio) Palombella:
Bishop Callisto Maria (Vincenzo Antonio) Palombella O.S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015